MI HB4246 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; state transportation department; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; state transportation department; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-06-13HouseTransmitted
2019-06-13HousePassed Roll Call # 127 Yeas 57 Nays 52
2019-06-13HouseRead A Third Time
2019-06-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-06-13HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted And Amended
2019-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2019-06-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-06-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Matt Maddock

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback