MI HB4251 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 472'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 472'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Counties; boards and commissions; requirement for competitive bidding by county road commissions on certain projects involving townships; provide for. Amends 1909 PA 283 (MCL 220.1 - 239.6) by adding sec. 19c to ch. IV.
Title
Counties; boards and commissions; requirement for competitive bidding by county road commissions on certain projects involving townships; provide for. Amends 1909 PA 283 (MCL 220.1 - 239.6) by adding sec. 19c to ch. IV.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Cotter [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Rep. Martin Howrylak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 915 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 777 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 777 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 472'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:40 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:30 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 11:42 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-5 To Senate Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 915 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-5 To Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-5 To Senate Substitute S-3 |
2014-12-19 | House | Retransmitted |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 777 Yeas 108 Nays 2 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In As Substituted H-5 |
2014-12-19 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2014-06-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 207 Yeas 92 Nays 17 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-02-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/14/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |