MI HB4271 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: curriculum; mathematics requirement for Michigan merit curriculum; revise. Amends secs. 1278a & 1278b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a & 380.1278b).
Title
Education: curriculum; mathematics requirement for Michigan merit curriculum; revise. Amends secs. 1278a & 1278b of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a & 380.1278b).
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Gary Eisen [R] | Sen. Michele Hoitenga [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-02-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |