MI HB4291 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance: statements and reports; campaign statement filing schedules; modify. Amends secs. 33 & 34 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.233 & 169.234).
Title
Campaign finance: statements and reports; campaign statement filing schedules; modify. Amends secs. 33 & 34 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.233 & 169.234).
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Calley [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Kristy Pagan [D] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Rep. Kara Hope [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2020-01-16 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 22 Yeas 100 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-03-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/05/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2019-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |