MI HB4296 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Assigned Pa 40'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Assigned Pa 40'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; costs and fees; e-filing fee; extend sunset. Amends sec. 1993 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1993).
Title
Civil procedure; costs and fees; e-filing fee; extend sunset. Amends sec. 1993 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.1993).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Assigned Pa 40'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-07-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/26/2019 03:32 Pm |
2019-07-02 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/26/2019 01:43 Pm |
2019-06-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/24/2019 04:19 Pm |
2019-06-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2019-06-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Graham Filler |