MI HB4310 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 153'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 153'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: horse racing; third-party facilitator licenses; provide for. Amends secs. 6a, 8, 9, 17, 19, 19a, 20 & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.306a et seq.) & adds secs. 8a, 19c & 20a.
Title
Gaming: horse racing; third-party facilitator licenses; provide for. Amends secs. 6a, 8, 9, 17, 19, 19a, 20 & 22 of 1995 PA 279 (MCL 431.306a et seq.) & adds secs. 8a, 19c & 20a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 360 (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 354 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 354 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 153'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:50 Am |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:18 Am |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:01 Pm |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-12-11 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 360 Yeas 99 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Title Amended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 354 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-10-30 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 292 Yeas 67 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Hank Vaupel |