MI HB4342 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: teachers; exception for college credit requirements for an individual to serve as a substitute teacher; provide for family member of pupil. Amends sec. 1233 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1233).
Title
Education: teachers; exception for college credit requirements for an individual to serve as a substitute teacher; provide for family member of pupil. Amends sec. 1233 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1233).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-03-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/13/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Brad Paquette |