MI HB4355 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 393'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 393'16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; animal shelters; ICHAT search by animal control shelters and animal protection shelters when allowing an animal adoption; require. Amends 1969 PA 287 (MCL 287.331 - 287.340) by adding sec. 8b.
Title
Animals; animal shelters; ICHAT search by animal control shelters and animal protection shelters when allowing an animal adoption; require. Amends 1969 PA 287 (MCL 287.331 - 287.340) by adding sec. 8b.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Muxlow [R] | Sen. John Bizon [R] | Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Rep. Dave Pagel [R] |
Rep. Harvey Santana [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 738 (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 824 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 88 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 824 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 88 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 393'16 |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:46 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 11:02 Am |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 10:54 Am |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Roll Call # 738 Yeas 84 Nays 24 |
2016-12-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-15 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 824 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | House | Transmitted |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 88 Nays 17 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/19/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Paul Muxlow |