MI HB4426 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 448'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 448'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; assessment of points for certain speeding violations; modify, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 320a, 606, 608, 609 & 610 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).
Title
Traffic control; violations; assessment of points for certain speeding violations; modify, and make other revisions. Amends secs. 320a, 606, 608, 609 & 610 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. John Kivela [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 628 (Y: 78 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 694 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 343 (Y: 75 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 694 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 343 (Y: 75 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 (Y: 67 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 448'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/5/2017 @ 10:54 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/4/2017 @ 2:10 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2016 @ 4:10 Pm |
2016-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 628 Yeas 78 Nays 30 |
2016-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 694 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-06-01 | House | Passed Roll Call # 343 Yeas 75 Nays 34 |
2016-06-01 | House | Transmitted |
2016-02-17 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2016-02-17 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 67 Nays 39 |
2016-02-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-02-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2015-04-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-04-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-04-14 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): transportation
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: violations
Traffic control: speed restrictions
Traffic control: violations