MI HB4442 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 403'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 403'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for operating vessel, ORV, or snowmobile while intoxicated or visibly impaired by alcohol or a controlled substance; prohibit. Amends sec. 13g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4441'13, HB 4443'13, HB 4445'13
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for operating vessel, ORV, or snowmobile while intoxicated or visibly impaired by alcohol or a controlled substance; prohibit. Amends sec. 13g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4441'13, HB 4443'13, HB 4445'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 684 (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 813 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 623 (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 813 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 623 (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 403'14 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:27 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:08 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:16 Am |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Roll Call # 684 Yeas 80 Nays 28 |
2014-12-17 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 813 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 623 Yeas 84 Nays 25 |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Amended |
2014-12-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/14/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Lori |
Subjects
Crimes, intoxication or impairment
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Watercraft, traffic control
Watercraft, violations
Criminal procedure, sentencing guidelines
Watercraft, traffic control
Watercraft, violations