MI HB4443 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 404'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 404'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; snowmobiles; operation of a snowmobile by certain individuals under the influence of or visibly impaired by alcohol or a controlled substance; prohibit. Amends secs. 82101, 82127, 82128, 82129, 82130, 82136, 82139, 82140, 82142, 82143, 82144, 82146 & 82148 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101 et seq.) & adds secs. 82129a & 82129b.
Title
Vehicles; snowmobiles; operation of a snowmobile by certain individuals under the influence of or visibly impaired by alcohol or a controlled substance; prohibit. Amends secs. 82101, 82127, 82128, 82129, 82130, 82136, 82139, 82140, 82142, 82143, 82144, 82146 & 82148 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101 et seq.) & adds secs. 82129a & 82129b.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pagel [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 814 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 624 (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 624 (Y: 85 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 404'14 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:29 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:10 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:18 Am |
2014-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 814 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-04 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 624 Yeas 85 Nays 24 |
2014-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-03 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-03-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/14/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-03-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Pagel |