MI HB4459 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 234'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 234'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; charges by nonparticipating providers; regulate. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding art. 18. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4990'19, HB 4460'19, HB 4991'19
Title
Health: other; charges by nonparticipating providers; regulate. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding art. 18. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4990'19, HB 4460'19, HB 4991'19
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] | Rep. Angela Witwer [D] | Rep. Frank Liberati [D] | Rep. Matt Koleszar [D] |
Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 465 (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Assigned Pa 234'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:16 Pm |
2020-10-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:30 Am |
2020-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/16/2020 01:48 Pm |
2020-10-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-10-13 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 465 Yeas 97 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-10-13 | House | Senate Substitute (s-7) Concurred In |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-7) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-7) |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Substitute (s-7) Concurred In |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-7) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-4) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Insurance And Banking |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-06-24 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 101 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-24 | House | Substitute (h-6) Adopted |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-6) |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-5) |
2019-04-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-04-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |
Subjects
Health facilities: other
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: other
Insurance: health insurers
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: other
Insurance: health insurers
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services