MI HB4544 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Worker's compensation; exclusive remedy; application to employees of professional employer organizations; revise. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 123.
Title
Worker's compensation; exclusive remedy; application to employees of professional employer organizations; revise. Amends 1969 PA 317 (MCL 418.101 - 418.941) by adding sec. 123.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] | Rep. Jim Lilly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-05-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2019-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
Subjects
Occupations: employment agencies
Worker's compensation: benefits
Worker's compensation: definitions
Worker's compensation: exclusive remedy
Worker's compensation: benefits
Worker's compensation: definitions
Worker's compensation: exclusive remedy
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4544 |
Text | http://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4544.htm |