MI HB4686 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 225'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Gaming: casinos; removal of name from disassociated persons list; allow. Amends sec. 25 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.225).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming: casinos; removal of name from disassociated persons list; allow. Amends sec. 25 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.225).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 379 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 170 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 166 (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14HouseAssigned Pa 225'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/16/2020 05:26 Pm
2020-10-14HouseApproved By The Governor 10/16/2020 08:12 Am
2020-10-01HousePresented To The Governor 10/05/2020 03:32 Pm
2020-09-30HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-09-30HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-09-30HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-09-30SenateInserted Full Title
2020-09-30SenatePassed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 379 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-09-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-09-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-09-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-09-16SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-04-16SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-03-17HouseTransmitted
2020-03-17HousePassed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 170 Yeas 91 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 18
2020-03-17HouseVote Reconsidered
2020-03-17HouseTitle Amended
2020-03-17HousePassed By 3/4 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 166 Yeas 89 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 20
2020-03-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-03-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-03-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-03-17HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2020-03-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-03-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-03-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-02-25HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-05-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/29/2019
2019-05-28HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-05-28HouseRead A First Time
2019-05-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Ryan Berman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4686
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0225.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-02-25-020.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-17-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-16-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-30-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback