MI HB4770 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Weapons; firearms; certain provisions regarding weapons; repeal. Amends secs. 231 & 237a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.231 & 750.237a) & repeals secs. 227, 227a, 227c, 227d, 231a & 234d of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.227 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; firearms; certain provisions regarding weapons; repeal. Amends secs. 231 & 237a of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.231 & 750.237a) & repeals secs. 227, 227a, 227c, 227d, 231a & 234d of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.227 et seq.).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-06-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/26/2019
2019-06-20HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2019-06-20HouseRead A First Time
2019-06-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback