MI HB4815 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: spirits; cap or additional amount the liquor control commission may pay a vendor of spirits; eliminate. Amends sec. 205 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1205).
Title
Liquor: spirits; cap or additional amount the liquor control commission may pay a vendor of spirits; eliminate. Amends sec. 205 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1205).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
2019-06-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/26/2019 |
2019-07-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4815 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4815.htm |