MI HB4849 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 8'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 8'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemeteries and funerals; other; money held by a county for care and preservation of cemetery lots; require to be presumed abandoned under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2, 3, 5 & 6 of 1903 PA 81 (MCL 128.82 et seq.); adds secs. 1a, 9 & 10 & repeals sec. 4 of 1903 PA 81 (MCL 128.84).
Title
Cemeteries and funerals; other; money held by a county for care and preservation of cemetery lots; require to be presumed abandoned under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2, 3, 5 & 6 of 1903 PA 81 (MCL 128.82 et seq.); adds secs. 1a, 9 & 10 & repeals sec. 4 of 1903 PA 81 (MCL 128.84).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Pa 8'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/26/2018 @ 2:10 Pm |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/26/2018 @ 1:04 Pm |
2018-01-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/19/2018 @ 3:15 Pm |
2018-01-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-10-11 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-10-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-10-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-08-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/12/2017 |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2017-07-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |