MI HB4856 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 460'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 460'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; transporting medical marihuana in motor vehicle; allow under certain circumstances. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 474.
Title
Crimes; other; transporting medical marihuana in motor vehicle; allow under certain circumstances. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 474.
Sponsors
Rep. David Agema [R] | Rep. Timothy Bledsoe [D] | Rep. Mike Callton [R] | Rep. Phil Cavanagh [D] |
Rep. Kevin Cotter [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] |
Rep. Gail Haines [R] | Rep. Joe Haveman [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] |
Rep. Bradford Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Nancy Jenkins [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Sen. Marty Knollenberg [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Kurtz [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Rick Olson [R] |
Rep. Paul Opsommer [R] | Rep. Mark Ouimet [R] | Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] |
Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Rep. Roy Schmidt [D] | Rep. Sharon Tyler [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 895 (Y: 96 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1000 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1000 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 460'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:20 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:46 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:40 Pm |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 895 Yeas 96 Nays 10 |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 1000 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-03 | House | Transmitted |
2012-05-03 | House | Rep. Douglas Geiss[*][*] Removed As Co-sponsor |
2012-05-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 Yeas 93 Nays 16 |
2012-05-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-05-02 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2012-05-02 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2012-05-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-07-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/01/2011 |
2011-06-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-06-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Glardon |