MI HB4856 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; nullification of certain endorsements on teaching certificates or grade-level certifications included in teaching certificates after 7 years of disuse; provide for. Amends sec. 1532 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1532).
Title
Education; teachers; nullification of certain endorsements on teaching certificates or grade-level certifications included in teaching certificates after 7 years of disuse; provide for. Amends sec. 1532 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1532).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2019 |
2019-08-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2019-08-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-08-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4856 |
Text | http://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4856.htm |