MI HB4908 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Assigned Pa 73'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-16 - Assigned Pa 73'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; bonds; limitation on the aggregate cap on outstanding bonds; increase. Amends sec. 32 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1432).
Title
State financing and management; bonds; limitation on the aggregate cap on outstanding bonds; increase. Amends sec. 32 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1432).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 113 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-16 | House | Assigned Pa 73'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-04-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 04/02/2020 09:56 Am |
2020-04-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 04/02/2020 08:44 Am |
2020-03-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/19/2020 01:20 Pm |
2020-03-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 113 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-11-07 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 103 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2019 |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2019-09-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Karen Whitsett |