MI HB4916 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 149'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 149'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; other; lawful sports betting act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Gaming; other; lawful sports betting act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 365 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 288 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 288 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 149'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:42 Am |
2019-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:26 Am |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:11 Pm |
2019-12-11 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-12-11 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 365 Yeas 100 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | House | Rule Suspended |
2019-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-30 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-30 | House | Title Amended |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 288 Yeas 63 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/05/2019 |
2019-09-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-09-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |