MI HB4980 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Assigned Pa 193'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-17)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Assigned Pa 193'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: expunction; certain convictions to be automatically set aside after 10 years under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 4 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.622 et seq.) & adds secs. 1g, 1h & 1i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4981'19, HB 4982'19, HB 4983'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4985'19, HB 5120'19
Title
Criminal procedure: expunction; certain convictions to be automatically set aside after 10 years under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 3 & 4 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.622 et seq.) & adds secs. 1g, 1h & 1i. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4981'19, HB 4982'19, HB 4983'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4985'19, HB 5120'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 423 (Y: 93 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 193'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/13/2020 11:30 Am |
2020-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/13/2020 10:02 Am |
2020-09-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/29/2020 03:32 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 423 Yeas 93 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-6) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-6) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 332 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-6) As Amended |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Substitute (s-6) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-6) And Amendment(s) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-5) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-5) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-11-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-05 | House | Title Amended |
2019-11-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 95 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/18/2019 |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Eric Leutheuser |