MI HB5113 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 421'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 421'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; public services; enforcing a municipal water or sewage system lien; modify term. Amends sec. 2 of 1939 PA 178 (MCL 123.162).
Title
Local government; public services; enforcing a municipal water or sewage system lien; modify term. Amends sec. 2 of 1939 PA 178 (MCL 123.162).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 761 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 421'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/4/2017 @ 11:30 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/3/2017 @ 8:00 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 4:04 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 761 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 Yeas 102 Nays 4 |
2016-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-19 | House | Amended |
2016-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-12-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/04/2015 |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2015-12-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |
Subjects
Liens: other
Local government: public services
Public utilities: municipal utilities
Public utilities: water utilities
Local government: public services
Public utilities: municipal utilities
Public utilities: water utilities