MI HB5118 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 43'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 43'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; wrongful imprisonment compensation act; extend the time for claims by individuals who were released before the effective date of the act. Amends sec. 7 of 2016 PA 343 (MCL 691.1757). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0068'19, HB 5117'19
Title
Civil procedure; other; wrongful imprisonment compensation act; extend the time for claims by individuals who were released before the effective date of the act. Amends sec. 7 of 2016 PA 343 (MCL 691.1757). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0068'19, HB 5117'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 68 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 54 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 318 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 54 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 318 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned Pa 43'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 03:58 Pm |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/03/2020 12:33 Pm |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/21/2020 01:36 Pm |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 68 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-18 | House | Retransmitted |
2020-02-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 54 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Amended |
2020-02-18 | House | Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-11-06 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 318 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2019 |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-10-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Calley |