MI HB5131 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; securities; notification of suspected cases of financial exploitation of certain adults by broker-dealers and investment advisors; allow. Amends title of 2008 PA 551 (MCL 451.2101 - 451.2703) & adds art. 5A.
Title
Occupations; securities; notification of suspected cases of financial exploitation of certain adults by broker-dealers and investment advisors; allow. Amends title of 2008 PA 551 (MCL 451.2101 - 451.2703) & adds art. 5A.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-10-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2019-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Angela Witwer |
Subjects
Occupations: advisors and counselors
Occupations: securities
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Occupations: securities
State agencies (existing): insurance and financial services
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-5131 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-5131.htm |