MI HB5179 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 427'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 427'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; certain state land located in Wayne county; provide for transfer. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property; conveyances; certain state land located in Wayne county; provide for transfer. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 795 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 883 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 883 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 427'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:38 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 9:18 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 2:10 Pm |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 795 Yeas 106 Nays 4 |
2014-12-18 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2014-12-18 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 883 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2014-12-03 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 609 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2014-12-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-11-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-11-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-12-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/06/2013 |
2013-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2013-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |