MI HB5195 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 428'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 428'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Food; processors; wild game sausage; allow mixing of game from more than 1 owner and not butchered by a licensed food establishment if consumer is given written advisory. Amends sec. 7115 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.7115).
Title
Food; processors; wild game sausage; allow mixing of game from more than 1 owner and not butchered by a licensed food establishment if consumer is given written advisory. Amends sec. 7115 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.7115).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 819 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 428'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:40 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:38 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:42 Am |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 819 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2014-04-17 | House | Transmitted |
2014-04-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 188 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2014-04-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-27 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-12-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/13/2013 |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2013-12-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |