MI HB5241 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 15'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; insurers; exemption relating to requirements for a valuation manual; eliminate. Amends sec. 836b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.836b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; insurers; exemption relating to requirements for a valuation manual; eliminate. Amends sec. 836b of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.836b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28HouseAssigned Pa 15'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-01-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:22 Pm
2020-01-28HouseApproved By The Governor 01/27/2020 01:51 Pm
2020-01-21HousePresented To The Governor 01/17/2020 02:54 Pm
2020-01-15HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-01-15HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-01-15HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-01-15SenateInserted Full Title
2020-01-15SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 12 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-01-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-01-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-01-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-01-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-01-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-12-05SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
2019-12-04HouseTransmitted
2019-12-04HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 333 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2019-12-04HouseRead A Third Time
2019-12-04HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-12-04HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-04HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-12-03HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-11-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/20/2019
2019-11-13HouseReferred To Committee On Insurance
2019-11-13HouseRead A First Time
2019-11-13HouseIntroduced By Representative Daire Rendon

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback