MI HB5283 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 203'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 203'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; definition of demolition within the brownfield redevelopment financing act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652).
Title
Economic development; brownfield redevelopment authority; definition of demolition within the brownfield redevelopment financing act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2652).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 203'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:36 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:24 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/11/2018 @ 10:56 Am |
2018-06-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-06 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 398 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 199 Yeas 66 Nays 43 |
2018-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/29/2017 |
2017-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Frederick |