MI HB5288 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 423'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 423'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; attorneys; individuals licensed to practice law as a military spouse; require certain notifications to board of law examiners. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 947a.
Title
Occupations; attorneys; individuals licensed to practice law as a military spouse; require certain notifications to board of law examiners. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 947a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 799 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 423'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/4/2017 @ 11:34 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/3/2017 @ 7:06 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 4:06 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 799 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-09-22 | House | Transmitted |
2016-09-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 497 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2016-09-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-09-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-09-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-05-12 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2016-02-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-02-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Wittenberg |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |