MI HB5302 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 506'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 506'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; funds; local road agencies; require adoption of best practices and asset management standards as a condition of receiving funds. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 18j.
Title
Transportation; funds; local road agencies; require adoption of best practices and asset management standards as a condition of receiving funds. Amends 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.651 - 247.675) by adding sec. 18j.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 834 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 891 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 891 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 506'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:18 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:20 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 834 Yeas 65 Nays 43 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 891 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 380 Yeas 63 Nays 45 |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2012-01-31 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2012 |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Roy Schmidt |
Same As/Similar To
SB0913 (Same As) 2012-01-26 - Referred To Committee On Transportation