MI HB5326 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 383'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 383'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; pharmaceuticals; dispensing opioid antagonist pursuant to a standing order; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7422, 17708 & 17757 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7422 et seq.) & adds sec. 17744e.
Title
Health; pharmaceuticals; dispensing opioid antagonist pursuant to a standing order; allow under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 7422, 17708 & 17757 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7422 et seq.) & adds sec. 17744e.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Rep. Andy Schor [D] | Rep. Bill LaVoy [D] | Sen. Peter Lucido [R] |
Rep. Gretchen Driskell [D] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Edward Canfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 623 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 690 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 690 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 383'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2016 @ 1:26 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2016 @ 1:07 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 4:18 Pm |
2016-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 623 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 690 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-05-12 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 266 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-05-12 | House | Amended |
2016-05-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-12 | House | Title Amended |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2016-05-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/09/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-02-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Anthony Forlini |
Same As/Similar To
SB0778 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Subjects
Controlled substances: other
Health occupations: pharmacists
Health occupations: physicians
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals
Health: substance use disorder treatment
State agencies (existing): human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: pharmacists
Health occupations: physicians
Health: occupations
Health: pharmaceuticals
Health: substance use disorder treatment
State agencies (existing): human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs