MI HB5421 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 557'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 557'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; health benefits; management of certain health care trust funds; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1999 PA 149 (MCL 38.1212) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Title
Retirement; health benefits; management of certain health care trust funds; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1999 PA 149 (MCL 38.1212) & adds secs. 4a, 4b & 4c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 752 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 785 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 785 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 557'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/10/2017 @ 11:54 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/6/2017 @ 9:28 Am |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:36 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Roll Call # 752 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2016-12-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 785 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-04-14 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 103 Nays 5 |
2016-04-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Liability Reform |
2016-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |