MI HB5571 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 523'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 523'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Property; conveyances; property in city of Springfield in Calhoun County; eliminate reverter clause. Creates land transfer act.
Title
Property; conveyances; property in city of Springfield in Calhoun County; eliminate reverter clause. Creates land transfer act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 523'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 11:54 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 4:58 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:42 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed By 2/3 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 758 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-05-26 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed By 2/3 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 326 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2016-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-26 | House | Title Amended |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-25 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2016-05-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-04-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced By Representative John Bizon |