MI HB5596 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Construction; asbestos; provision allowing the withholding of payment to asbestos abatement contractors or demolition contractors for environmental violations; require certain local government contracts to contain. Creates new act.
Title
Construction; asbestos; provision allowing the withholding of payment to asbestos abatement contractors or demolition contractors for environmental violations; require certain local government contracts to contain. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/20/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2018-02-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |
Subjects
Construction: asbestos
Construction: contracts
Environmental protection: other
Law: contracts
Local government: authorities
Local government: other
Construction: contracts
Environmental protection: other
Law: contracts
Local government: authorities
Local government: other