MI HB5626 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 481'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 481'16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; adoption; advertise for, solicit, or recruit prospective adoptive or biological parents or guardians to participate in certain transfers of a child; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 55, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.55).
Title
Children; adoption; advertise for, solicit, or recruit prospective adoptive or biological parents or guardians to participate in certain transfers of a child; prohibit under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 55, ch. X of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 710.55).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 754 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 781 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 614 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 781 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 614 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 481'16 |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/6/2017 @ 1:06 Pm |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 12:19 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:44 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 754 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2016-12-15 | House | Rule Suspended |
2016-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 781 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 614 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/03/2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Hooker |
Same As/Similar To
SB0925 (Same As) 2016-11-09 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary