MI HB5664 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 524'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Assigned Pa 524'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; state employees; retired psychiatrists to provide services at psychiatric hospitals operated by the department of health and human services; allow under certain circumstances without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Title
Retirement; state employees; retired psychiatrists to provide services at psychiatric hospitals operated by the department of health and human services; allow under certain circumstances without forfeiting retirement allowance. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 721 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 767 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 767 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 524'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/9/2017 @ 11:56 Am |
2016-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/5/2017 @ 4:52 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:50 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Roll Call # 721 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2016-12-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 767 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/17/2016 |
2016-05-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-05-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |