MI HB5745 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 533'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 533'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; continued court jurisdiction in certain foster care guardianship cases; allow. Amends secs. 1 & 2a, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1 & 712A.2a).
Title
Children; foster care; continued court jurisdiction in certain foster care guardianship cases; allow. Amends secs. 1 & 2a, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1 & 712A.2a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 842 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 533'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:59 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:18 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 12:06 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 842 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-10-01 | House | Transmitted |
2014-10-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 520 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-10-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/10/2014 |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Nancy Jenkins |
Subjects
Children, foster care
Children, guardians
Children, services
Courts, jurisdiction
Human services, children's services
State agencies (existing), human services
Children, guardians
Children, services
Courts, jurisdiction
Human services, children's services
State agencies (existing), human services