MI HB5756 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 242'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State: identification cards; extension of renewal date for state identification cards during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.292) TIE BAR WITH: HB 5757'20, HB 6192'20

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State: identification cards; extension of renewal date for state identification cards during a declared emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.292) TIE BAR WITH: HB 5757'20, HB 6192'20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseAssigned Pa 242'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/28/2020 03:42 Pm
2020-10-28HouseApproved By The Governor 10/28/2020 02:04 Pm
2020-10-28HousePresented To The Governor 10/26/2020 03:10 Pm
2020-10-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled 10/21/2020
2020-10-21HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2020-10-21SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-10-21SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-10-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-10-21SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-10-21SenateRules Suspended
2020-10-13HouseTransmitted
2020-10-13HouseTitle Amended
2020-10-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
2020-10-13HouseRead A Third Time
2020-10-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-10-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-10-13HouseSubstitute (h-6) Adopted
2020-10-13HouseSubstitute (h-3) Not Adopted
2020-10-13HouseRead A Second Time
2020-10-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-10-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2020-10-13HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3)
2020-04-30HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2020
2020-04-30HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2020-04-30HouseRead A First Time
2020-04-30HouseIntroduced By Representative Mike Mueller

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback