MI HB5810 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 593'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 593'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health; other; certain alternative mental health treatment; replace with assisted outpatient treatment. Amends secs. 100a, 400, 401, 409, 434, 435, 436, 452, 455, 461, 464a, 468, 469a, 472a, 473, 474, 474a, 475, 475a, 477, 478, 482 & 489 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100a et seq.).
Title
Mental health; other; certain alternative mental health treatment; replace with assisted outpatient treatment. Amends secs. 100a, 400, 401, 409, 434, 435, 436, 452, 455, 461, 464a, 468, 469a, 472a, 473, 474, 474a, 475, 475a, 477, 478, 482 & 489 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 902 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 859 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 859 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 593'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 4:58 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 3:39 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:28 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Roll Call # 902 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 859 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-05-30 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-30 | House | Title Amended |
2018-05-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-29 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2018-04-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/17/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-04-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Hank Vaupel |
Subjects
Mental health: community mental health
Mental health: other
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Mental health: other
State agencies (existing): health and human services