MI HB5815 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; solid waste; incinerator, enforcement, and funding and grant provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11526, 11526a, 11527, 11528, 11531, 11532, 11533, 11539, 11540, 11541, 11546, 11549, 11550 & 11553 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11526 et seq.); by designating secs. 11526 & 11549 as subpt. 7, section 11550 as subpt. 8, sec. 11553 as subpt. 9 & repeals secs. 11529, 11534 - 11538, 11539a, 11547 & 11548 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11529 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5816'20, HB 5814'20, HB 5812'20, HB 5813'20, HB 5817'20
Title
Environmental protection; solid waste; incinerator, enforcement, and funding and grant provisions; revise. Amends secs. 11526, 11526a, 11527, 11528, 11531, 11532, 11533, 11539, 11540, 11541, 11546, 11549, 11550 & 11553 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11526 et seq.); by designating secs. 11526 & 11549 as subpt. 7, section 11550 as subpt. 8, sec. 11553 as subpt. 9 & repeals secs. 11529, 11534 - 11538, 11539a, 11547 & 11548 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11529 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5816'20, HB 5814'20, HB 5812'20, HB 5813'20, HB 5817'20
Sponsors
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Joseph Tate [D] | Rep. William Sowerby [D] |
Rep. Scott VanSingel [R] | Rep. Yousef Rabhi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/02/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-05-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5815 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5815.htm |