MI HB6138 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health facilities: long-term care facilities; reporting of COVID-19 data; require. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health facilities: long-term care facilities; reporting of COVID-19 data; require. Creates new act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2020-09-02HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/01/2020
2020-09-01HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2020-09-01HouseRead A First Time
2020-09-01HouseIntroduced By Representative Leslie Love

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback