MI HB6192 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 241'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 241'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: driver license; Traffic control; driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses and vehicle registrations; provide for. Amends secs. 216, 226, 255, 301, 306, 306a, 309, 312f, 312k, 314 & 801k of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.216 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5756'20, HB 5757'20
Title
Traffic control: driver license; Traffic control; driver license; extension of renewal date for certain driver licenses and vehicle registrations; provide for. Amends secs. 216, 226, 255, 301, 306, 306a, 309, 312f, 312k, 314 & 801k of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.216 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5756'20, HB 5757'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 486 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 386 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 386 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Assigned Pa 241'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:30 Pm |
2020-10-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:44 Am |
2020-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/16/2020 02:04 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-10-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 486 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-10-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Title Amended |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-09-15 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 386 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/09/2020 |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): state
Traffic control: driver license
Vehicles: other
Vehicles: registration
Traffic control: driver license
Vehicles: other
Vehicles: registration