MI HB6252 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; death; suicide prevention commission; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Health; death; suicide prevention commission; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 828 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 828 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-12-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-12 | House | Title Amended |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 828 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-04 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-08-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |
Subjects
Health: death
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): state police
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): military and veterans affairs
State agencies (existing): state police
State agencies (proposed): boards and commissions