MI HB6261 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 371'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-29 - Assigned Pa 371'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; registration of historic snowmobiles; allow, and provide for disposition of registration fees. Amends secs. 82101, 82106 & 82118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101 et seq.) & adds sec. 82105c.
Title
Vehicles; registration; registration of historic snowmobiles; allow, and provide for disposition of registration fees. Amends secs. 82101, 82106 & 82118 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101 et seq.) & adds sec. 82105c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-29 | Assigned Pa 371'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-29 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2010 @ 2:24 Pm | |
2010-12-29 | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2010 @ 1:40 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2010 @ 10:40 Am | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 635 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2010-11-30 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2010-11-30 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2010-09-14 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs | |
2010-09-08 | Transmitted | |
2010-09-08 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 369 Yeas 104 Nays 0 | |
2010-09-08 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-09-08 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-09-08 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-09-08 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-09-08 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-06-29 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-06-16 | Printed Bill Filed 06/16/2010 | |
2010-06-15 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2010-06-15 | Read A First Time | |
2010-06-15 | Introduced By Representative Joel Sheltrown |