MI HB6434 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; credit; credit for donation to a community foundation; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 261. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6433'18
Title
Individual income tax; credit; credit for donation to a community foundation; provide for. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 261. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6433'18
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 818 (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Regulatory Reform (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Regulatory Reform (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-12-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 818 Yeas 103 Nays 6 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-11-28 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-10-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/04/2018 |
2018-10-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-10-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-10-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |