MI HB6440 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Postponed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Local government: other; publication of legal notices; revise, and create the local government public notice act. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government: other; publication of legal notices; revise, and create the local government public notice act. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-02HousePostponed Temporarily
2020-12-02HouseRead A Third Time
2020-12-02HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-12-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-12-02HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-12-02HouseRead A Second Time
2020-12-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-12-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-11-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/18/2020
2020-11-12HouseReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2020-11-12HouseRead A First Time
2020-11-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback