MI SB0019 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers: other; 1968 PA 317 regarding contracts of public servants with public entities; modify certain population thresholds. Amends sec. 3a of 1968 PA 317 (MCL 15.323a).
Title
Public employees and officers: other; 1968 PA 317 regarding contracts of public servants with public entities; modify certain population thresholds. Amends sec. 3a of 1968 PA 317 (MCL 15.323a).
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 25 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2019-04-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received On 04/23/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 25 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale Zorn |