MI SB0047 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Assigned Pa 0116'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - Assigned Pa 0116'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: assessments; placement of solar panels on residential real property; exclude from assessment of true cash value. Amends sec. 27 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4069'19
Title
Property tax: assessments; placement of solar panels on residential real property; exclude from assessment of true cash value. Amends sec. 27 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4069'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 284 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 132 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 132 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0116'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/15/2019 09:18 Am |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor 11/14/2019 01:39 Pm |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Presented To Governor 11/04/2019 02:13 Pm |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 284 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-10-29 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-10-08 | House | Returned To Senate |
2019-10-08 | House | Title Amended |
2019-10-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 252 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-09-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-09-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-09-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-06-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 132 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |