MI SB0048 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; exemptions; alternative energy personal property; modify exemption. Amends sec. 9i of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9i). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0047'19
Title
Property tax; exemptions; alternative energy personal property; modify exemption. Amends sec. 9i of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9i). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0047'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 133 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 133 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |